23andMe, Inc. v. Karen Davis-Hudson et al
Petitioner: 23andMe, Inc.
Respondent: Karen Davis-Hudson and Sarah Diaz
Case Number: 3:2015cv01323
Filed: March 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 22, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 7, 2015. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 16, 2015, re 6 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 23andMe, Inc. v. Karen Davis-Hudson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 23andMe, Inc.
Represented By: Jason G Cabot
Represented By: Alexander K Talarides
Represented By: Robert P. Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Karen Davis-Hudson
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sarah Diaz
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?