Lorenz et al v. The Board of Trustees of the Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund for California et al
Plaintiff: Terri Lorenz, Kenneth D Walker and Bay Area Construction Frames, Inc.
Defendant: The Board of Trustees Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund for California, The Board of Trustees Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees Carpenters Annuity Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees Carpenters Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund for Northern California, Contract Work Preservation Trust Fund for Northern California, Construction Industry Advancement Fund and Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties
Case Number: 3:2015cv01430
Filed: March 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/12/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting, as modified, 79 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 5/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/03/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2016. In their Case Management Conference Statement, the parties shall address what issues, if any, remain for resolution by the Court following this Order and the April 27, 2016 settlement conference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/06/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference continued to 1/26/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/05/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 43 Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Kenneth D. Walker Only. Kenneth D Walker terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/16/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/18/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Stipulation. Case Management Conference continued to 8/4/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/10/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Counsel to file a Joint Case Management Statement by 7/9/2015. Case Management Conference continued to 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/07/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 23 Stipulation - Case Management Conference continued to 7/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/03/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorenz et al v. The Board of Trustees of the Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund for California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lorenz
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D Walker
Represented By: Peter W. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Construction Frames, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Powell
Represented By: Paul Michael Vuksich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund for California
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees Carpenters Annuity Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees Carpenters Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contract Work Preservation Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Construction Industry Advancement Fund
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenters 46 Northern California Counties
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?