Bitstamp, Ltd v. Ripple Labs Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bitstamp Ltd.
Defendant: Nancy Harris, Ripple Labs Inc., Mr. Jed McCaleb, Stellar Development Foundation and Jacob Stephenson
Cross Defendant: George Frost
Case Number: 3:2015cv01503
Filed: April 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2016 Filing 181 AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ANDRETURN THE DISPUTED FUNDS AND XRP DEPOSITED WITH THE COURT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #180 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 12, 2016 Filing 180 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Amended) to Dismiss this Action with Prejudice and Return the Disputed Funds and XRP Deposited with the Court filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 7, 2016 Filing 179 Receipt reflecting delivery of 125 sealed document (the private key to the 96,342,361.6 Interpleaded XRP to counsel for Ripple Labs, Inc. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #176 Stipulation. The Court shall deliver the $942,138.24 Interpleaded Funds currently in the Court's registry to SDF by sending a check payable to Stellar Development Foundation to SDF's counsel, Gross Belsky Alonso LLP. The Clerk of the Court is directed to deliver to a representative of Ripple, the private key to the 96,342,361.6 Interpleaded XRP previously filed on August 19, 2015, Dkt. 125, and referenced as "sealed document" in the Court docket. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 1, 2016 Filing 177 Letter from Nicole L. Chessari Regarding Private Key. (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 176 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss this Action with Prejudice and Return the Disputed Funds and XRP Deposited with the Court filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #174 STIPULATION to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Ripple Labs Inc. Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 174 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 11, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by TL on 2/11/16. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 8, 2016 Filing 173 STATUS REPORT Jointly Filed by Ripple Labs Inc., Ripple Labs Inc., Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 20, 2016 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by TL on 1/20/2016. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 2/11/2016, at 3:00 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge 01/14/2016 granting #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #130 Motion to Strike, and #157 Motion to Strike. Bitstamp and Frost's motions to strike Stellar Development Foundation's first cause of action are GRANTED. Frost's motion to dismiss SDF's second and third causes of action is also GRANTED. Any amended complaint must be filed within twenty days of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
December 17, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by TL on 12/17/2015. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 1/20/2016, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 11, 2015 Filing 171 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/02/2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 3:06 p.m. - 4:10 p.m. = 64 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #169 Transcript Order, #170 Transcript Order, #168 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2016. (Related documents(s) #169 , #170 , #168 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Bitstamp Ltd. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Jed McCaleb, Jed McCaleb, Stellar Development Foundation, Stellar Development Foundation for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 168 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ripple Labs Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 2, 2015 Filing 167 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing re #157 MOTION to Dismiss Stellar Development Foundation's Cross-Claims and #130 MOTION to Strike. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2106 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor (Case Management Statement du 2/16/2016.) Deadline to amend/add parties: 5/1/2016. Jury Trial set for 2/6/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Written order to follow as to motions. Parties to meet and confer to agree upon a case management schedule. FTR Time 3:06-4:10. Plaintiff Attorneys Kelly Woodruff and Jessica K. Nall. Defendant Attorneys Terry Gross, Adam C. Belsky, Grant P. Fondo, Nicole L. Chessari, Spencer Hosie, and Paul Rugani. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/2/2015) Modified on 2/11/2016 to add CMC information (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Tamara Lange, ADR Program Staff Attorney, on 11/30/2015. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 12/17/2015 at 2:00 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 166 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Stellar Development Foundation, Stellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 165 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stellar Development Foundation, Stellar Development Foundation Stellar Development Foundation's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civil L.R. 3-15 (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 18, 2015 Filing 164 REPLY (re #157 MOTION to Strike and Motion to Dismiss Stellar Development Foundation's Cross-Claims* MOTION to Strike and Motion to Dismiss Stellar Development Foundation's Cross-Claims* ) filed byGeorge Frost. (Lee, Anthony) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 11, 2015 Filing 163 RESPONSE (re #157 MOTION to Strike and Motion to Dismiss Stellar Development Foundation's Cross-Claims* MOTION to Strike and Motion to Dismiss Stellar Development Foundation's Cross-Claims* ) filed byStellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 11/11/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER TERMINATING STAY OF STELLAR DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION'S CROSSCLAIM AGAINST RIPPLE LABS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/10/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE by Ripple Labs Inc. and Request to Terminate Stay of Stellar Development Foundation's Crossclaim Against Ripple Labs (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole L. Chessari, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Nicole L. Chessari, #3 Proposed Order)(Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 4, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Tamara Lange, ADR Program Staff Attorney, on 11/4/2015. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 11/30/2015 at 2:00 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 160 CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference and hearing to #130 MOTION to Strike continued to 12/2/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER resetting deadlines as to #157 MOTION to Strike. Response due by 11/11/2015. Reply due by 11/18/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/2/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 29, 2015 Filing 158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #157 MOTION to Strike and Motion to Dismiss Stellar Development Foundation's Cross-Claims* MOTION to Strike and Motion to Dismiss Stellar Development Foundation's Cross-Claims* filed by Stellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 26, 2015 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled on 10/30/2015, has been rescheduled to 11/4/2015, at 2:30 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 157 Special MOTION to Strike *and Motion to Dismiss Stellar Development Foundation's Cross-Claims* filed by George Frost. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/30/2015. Replies due by 11/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lee, Anthony) (Filed on 10/16/2015) Modified on 10/20/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2015 Filing 156 REPLY (re #130 MOTION to Strike #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim [REDACTED] ) filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Woodruff, Kelly) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 155 CLERK'S NOTICE - Hearing as to #130 MOTION to Strike and Case Management Conference continued to 11/10/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #152 Stipulation to extend Deadlines as to #130 MOTION to Strike. Reply due by 10/14/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/6/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #147 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings on Stellar's Crossclaim. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 152 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Reply on Bitstamp's Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim filed by Bitstamp Ltd.. (Woodruff, Kelly) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 5, 2015 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled on 10/6/2015 at 2:30 PM Pacific time has been rescheduled to 10/30/2015 at 11:00 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 151 RESPONSE (re #130 MOTION to Strike #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim [REDACTED] ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #148 filed byStellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 150 CLERK'S NOTICE - Further Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 149 Declaration of Terry Gross in Support of Stellar Development Foundation's #148 Opposition to Bitstamp's Special Motion to Strike filed byStellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 9/30/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2015 Filing 148 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #151 FOR THE CORRECT E-FILING RESPONSE (re #130 MOTION to Strike #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim [REDACTED] ) filed byStellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 9/29/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2015 Filing 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stay Proceedings on Stellar's Crossclaim filed by Stellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Order Extending Cross-Defendant's Time to Respond by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #142 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING AND MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON BITSTAMP'S SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTERCLAIM granting, as amended, #144 STIPULATION. Deadlines continued as to #130 MOTION to Strike. Response due by 9/29/2015. Reply due by 10/6/2015. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/21/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 144 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #130 MOTION to Strike #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim [REDACTED] filed by Stellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING AND MODIFY BREIFING SCHEDULE ON BITSTAMPS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTERCLAIM granting #142 STIPULATION. Response due by 9/22/2015. Reply due by 9/29/2015. Motion continued to 10/14/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/16/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 16, 2015 Filing 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by George Frost. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 16, 2015 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 9/16/2015, has been rescheduled to 10/6/2015 at 2:30 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 141 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #130 MOTION to Strike #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim [REDACTED], #139 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION to Strike #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim [REDACTED] To Continue Hearing and Modify Briefing Schedule on Bitstamp's Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim filed by Stellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 140 RESPONSE (re #139 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION to Strike #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim [REDACTED] ) filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Woodruff, Kelly) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 11, 2015 Filing 139 Emergency MOTION & [PROPOSED] ODER for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #130 MOTION to Strike #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim [REDACTED] filed by Stellar Development Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Gross, Terry) (Filed on 9/11/2015) Modified on 9/14/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2015 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell Rae Atkinson (Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Kenhong Lee (Lee, Anthony) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Sue Rice (Rice, Diane) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Hosie (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 134 CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference continued to 10/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (to coincide with hearing as to #130 Motion to Strike). Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2015. (CMC set for 9/22/2015 VACATED.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 9, 2015 Filing 133 Summons Issued as to George Frost. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
September 8, 2015 Filing 132 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM & CROSSCLAIM #122 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, byRipple Labs Inc.. (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 9/8/2015) Modified on 9/9/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2015 Filing 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bitstamp Ltd. re #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim, #130 MOTION to Strike #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim [REDACTED] (Woodruff, Kelly) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 130 MOTION to Strike #129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim [REDACTED] filed by Bitstamp Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/15/2015. Replies due by 9/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Woodruff, Kelly) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 129 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Special Motion to Strike Counterclaim filed by Bitstamp Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version, #4 Unredacted Version)(Woodruff, Kelly) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 28, 2015 Electronic filing error Re: #128 Proposed Summons filed by Stellar Development Foundation; Person listed in the "To" section of summons is not a named party in the case [err101]; This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 128 Proposed Summons. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 127 CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 19, 2015 Filing 125 ***DOCUMENT RETURNED TO COUNSEL FOR RIPPLE LABS; See #178 Order and #179 Receipt*** SEALED DOCUMENT - filed as directed by #124 Order Regarding Sealed Filing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).This is a Text Only Entry Modified on 4/7/2016 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER REGARDING SEALED FILING re #114 Notice of Filing Sealed Private Key for in camera Review. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 18, 2015 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 8/20/2015 is off calendar. Counsel should contact the ADR Unit to re-schedule this call if this case returns to the active docket of this Court. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ripple Labs Inc. for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 12, 2015 Filing 122 Stellar Development Foundation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Ripple Labs Inc., Bitstamp Ltd., COUNTERCLAIM against Ripple Labs Inc., Bitstamp Ltd. byStellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 8/12/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER DENYING BITSTAMP'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge William H. Orrick denying #80 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Sent by Inter-Office mail a copy of #120 Order to the USDC for the Northern District of California Finance Department. Re #120 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER TO RETURN A PORTION OF THE DISPUTED FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH THE COURT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #116 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #40 Motion to Compel. This action is STAYED pending the arbitrator's determination whether Ripple Labs's claims are arbitrable and, if they are, the resolution of the arbitration. The parties shall jointly advise me within 10 days of (i) the arbitrator's determination that the claims are not arbitrable, (ii) the arbitrator's award, in the event that the arbitrator determines that the claims are arbitrable, or (iii) the settlement of this dispute. Beginning six months from the date of this Order, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report every six months apprising the Court of the status of the arbitration. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Hon. William H. Orrick denying #10 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING STELLAR MOTION TO INTERVENE by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #39 Motion to Intervene. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 5, 2015 Filing 116 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Return A Portion of the Disputed Funds Deposited with the Court filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bitstamp Ltd. re #81 Order to File Farella Braun + Martel's Invoice (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 114 NOTICE by Ripple Labs Inc. of Filing Sealed Private Key for in camera Review (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 113 Declaration of Kelly Woodruff in Support of #111 Reply to Opposition/Response Declaration of Kelly Woodruff in Support of Bitstamp's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Related document(s) #111 ) (Woodruff, Kelly) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 112 Declaration of Jessica Nall in Support of #111 Reply to Opposition/Response Supplemental Declaration of Jessica Nall in Support of Bitstamp's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Related document(s) #111 ) (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 111 REPLY (re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Correction of Docket #77 ) filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER TO EFFECTUATE DEPOSIT OF XRP THROUGH THE FILING UNDER SEAL OF THE PRIVATE KEY by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #106 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 29, 2015 Filing 109 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/16/2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number 415-264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #102 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2015. (Related documents(s) #102 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order GRANTING #107 Stipulation re briefing schedule for motion for attorney's fees by Bitstamp Ltd. (wholc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 107 STIPULATION & [PROPOSED] ORDER re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Correction of Docket #77 Modifying Briefing Schedule filed by Bitstamp Ltd.. (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 7/27/2015) Modified on 7/28/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2015 Filing 106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Effectuate Deposit of XRP Through the Filing Under Seal of the Private Key filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 105 RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Correction of Docket #77 ) filed by Stellar Development Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Terry Gross, #2 Declaration Joyce Kim)(Gross, Terry) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 104 RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Correction of Docket #77 ) filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Ardinger, Andrew) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Bitstamp Ltd. for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 101 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson re #100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Ardinger, Andrew) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark S. Parris, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit B)(Parris, Mark) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #97 STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Response due by 7/20/2015. Reply due by 7/27/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/20/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 98 RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Correction of Docket #77 ) filed byNancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson. (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 17, 2015 Filing 97 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Stellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 96 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 7/16/2015 re #40 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings and #39 MOTION to Intervene . Case Management Conference continued to 9/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Counsel for Stellar raises issue as to control of the xrp funds. The funds will be deposited with the Court's Registry by July 24, 2015. The proper amount of funds deposited with the Court Registry is in dispute; and the parties are working together in an attempt to verify the amount of funds and will either submit a stipulated order or joint letter outlining any dispute. Court Reporter Name Rhonda Aquilina. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2015)
July 10, 2015 Filing 95 Declaration of Jessica K. Nall in Support of #94 Reply to Opposition/Response to Proposed Intervenor-Defendant Stellar Development Foundation's Motion to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a)(2) filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Related document(s) #94 ) (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
July 10, 2015 Filing 94 REPLY (re #39 MOTION to Intervene ) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a)(2) filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 93 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 92 Statement of Non-Opposition re #39 MOTION to Intervene filed byRipple Labs Inc.. (Related document(s) #39 ) (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Daniel Bowling, ADR Program Staff Attorney, on 7/9/2015. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 8/20/2015 at 11:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that the new call-in number is 641-715-3274; however, the access code remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 8, 2015 Filing 91 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jacob Stephenson identifying Other Affiliate Stellar Development Foundation for Jacob Stephenson. (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
July 8, 2015 Filing 90 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jed McCaleb identifying Other Affiliate Stellar Development Foundation for Jed McCaleb. (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
July 8, 2015 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nancy Harris identifying Corporate Parent Stellar Development Foundation for Nancy Harris. (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
July 6, 2015 Filing 88 NOTICE OF CORRECTED EXHIBIT A to #39 MOTION to Intervene. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 7/6/2015) Modified on 7/7/2015 to revise docket text reflecting that this filing is not a new motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re #86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Hearing on Bitstamp's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Ripple Labs Inc. Motion Hearing rescheduled for 8/12/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/06/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
July 6, 2015 Filing 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Hearing on Bitstamp's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
July 1, 2015 Filing 85 DEFENDANT ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury for Interpleader byJacob Stephenson. (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 7/1/2015) Modified on 7/2/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 Filing 84 DEFENDANT ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury for Interpleader byJed McCaleb. (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 7/1/2015) Modified on 7/2/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 Filing 83 DEFENDANT ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury for Interpleader byNancy Harris. (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 7/1/2015) Modified on 7/2/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2015 Filing 82 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, January 9, 2015 at 11:30 AM. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF CONTEMPORANEOUS TIME RECORDS re MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES [DKT. NO. #78 ](wholc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015) Modified on 7/1/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2015 Filing 80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Correction of Docket #77 filed by Bitstamp Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/17/2015. Replies due by 7/24/2015. (Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 26, 2015 Filing 79 Proposed Order re #77 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Bitstamp Ltd.. (Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 26, 2015 Filing 78 Declaration of Jessica K. Nall in Support of #77 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Related document(s) #77 ) (Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 26, 2015 Filing 77 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #80 FOR THE CORRECT E-FILING MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Bitstamp Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/10/2015. Replies due by 7/17/2015. (Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2015) Modified on 6/30/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2015 Filing 76 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 75 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearings. Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing as to #39 MOTION to Intervene and #40 Motion to Compel reschedule for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/25/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 73 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Jed McCaleb (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 72 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Jacob Stephenson (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 71 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Nancy Harris (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 24, 2015 Filing 70 REPLY (re #40 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings ) filed byJed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson. (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 23, 2015 Filing 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Proposed Intervenor-Defendant Stellar Development Foundation's Motion to Intervene and Cross-Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Stellar Development Foundation. (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #67 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Clarifying the Time for Filing of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Bitstamp Ltd.. (Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 17, 2015 Filing 66 RESPONSE (re #40 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings ) [Memorandum in Opposition to Cross-Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings] filed byRipple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 17, 2015 Filing 65 Statement re #39 MOTION to Intervene by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 16, 2015 Filing 64 Notice of Withdrawal of #41 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Interpleader (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 6/16/2015) Modified on 6/17/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting #20 Interpleader Plaintiff's Motion for an Order of Discharge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Terry Gross in Opposition to #20 MOTION For an Order of Discharge or, In the Alternative, for Voluntary Dismissal filed byNancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Stellar Development Foundation, Jacob Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #20 ) (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick: granting #59 Stipulation. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 5, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to: #39 MOTION to Intervene , #41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Interpleader, #40 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. (Refer to #60 Order.) Responses due by 6/17/2015. Replies due by 6/24/2015. Motion Hearing reset for 7/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATED ORDER TO DEPOSIT DISPUTED FUNDS WITH THE COURT, WITHDRAW MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND REVISE BRIEFING SCHEDULES FOR VARIOUS PENDING MOTIONS as Modified by Judge William H. Orrick. (Re: Dkt no. #55 ) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 5, 2015 Filing 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Bitstamp Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Bitstamp Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 6)(Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 57 Declaration of Jean-Baptiste Graftieaux in Support of #56 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #56 ) (Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 56 REPLY (re #20 MOTION For an Order of Discharge or, In the Alternative, for Voluntary Dismissal ) filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 4, 2015 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Deposit Disputed Funds with the Court, Withdraw Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and Revise Briefing Schedules for Various Pending Motions filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 2, 2015 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM - Motion Hearing as to #20 MOTION For an Order of Discharge set for 6/10/2015 02:00 PM will be conducted in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 53 RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION For an Order of Discharge or, In the Alternative, for Voluntary Dismissal ) filed byRipple Labs Inc.. (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 52 RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION For an Order of Discharge or, In the Alternative, for Voluntary Dismissal ) filed byNancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Stellar Development Foundation, Jacob Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jed McCaleb, #2 Declaration of Terry Gross, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Parris, Mark) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 51 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 05/22/15, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 3:07 - 3:38. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #45 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 6/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2015. (Related documents(s) #45 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Stipulation extending briefing deadlines as to #20 MOTION For an Order of Discharge or, In the Alternative, for Voluntary Dismissal. Responses due by 5/28/2015. Replies due by 6/4/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/28/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #33 Stipulation. The Individual Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in Interpleader is enlarged until June 1, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Revise Briefing Schedule for Bitstamp Ltd.'s Motion for an Order of Discharge or, in the Alternative, for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 27, 2015 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ripple Labs Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
May 26, 2015 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ardinger, Andrew) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 26, 2015 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Bitstamp Ltd. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Paul F. Rugari. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Mark S. Parris. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Hearing held on 5/22/2015. #31 Motion to dissolve is DENIED. The parties are directed to meet and confer immediately after the hearing over a narrowed scope of discovery and a schedule for resolution of both the motion for a preliminary injunction and the motion to compel arbitration, which shall be heard at the same time. If parties are unable to come to a complete agreement, they shall file a joint five-page letter outlining disputed issues. The parties shall file a stipulation and proposed order with respect to the matters agreed upon. The hearing for the motion for a preliminary injunction on June 10, 2015 is VACATED. FTR Time 3:07-3:28. Plaintiff Attorneys Christopher Wheeler and Jessica Nall. Defendant Attorneys Grant P. Fondo and Nicole L. Chessari for Ripple; Adam C. Belsky for Stellar; and Paul F. Rugani for McCaleb, et al. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Interpleader filed by Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/5/2015. Replies due by 6/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Motion to Dismiss)(Ramsey, Gabriel) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 40 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/5/2015. Replies due by 6/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Andinger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Ramsey, Gabriel) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 39 MOTION to Intervene filed by Stellar Development Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/5/2015. Replies due by 6/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Terry Gross, #3 Declaration Joyce Kim, #4 Proposed Order)(Gross, Terry) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 38 RESPONSE (re #31 MOTION to Dissolve or, in the Alternative, Modify Temporary Restraining Order re #24 Order,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, ) [Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants and Cross Defendants' Motion to Dissolve or Modify Temporary Restraining Order] filed byRipple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grant P. Fondo in Support Ripple Lab Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition)(Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Gross for Proposed Intervenor-Defendant Stellar Development Foundation (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE - Set/Reset Deadlines as to #31 MOTION to Dissolve or, in the Alternative, Modify Temporary Restraining Order re #24 Order. Motion Hearing reset for 5/22/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Response/Reply dates VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9539568.) filed by Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson. (Rugani, Paul) (Filed on 5/21/2015) Modified on 5/22/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9539469.) filed by Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson. (Parris, Mark) (Filed on 5/21/2015) Modified on 5/22/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2015 Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson. (Ramsey, Gabriel) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 32 Proposed Order re #31 MOTION to Dissolve or, in the Alternative, Modify Temporary Restraining Order re #24 Order,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, by Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson. (Ramsey, Gabriel) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION to Dissolve or, in the Alternative, Modify Temporary Restraining Order re #24 Order,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, filed by Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick Jr.. Responses due by 6/3/2015. Replies due by 6/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terry Gross, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ramsey, Gabriel) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Robert Ardinger (Ardinger, Andrew) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel M. Ramsey (Ramsey, Gabriel) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bitstamp Ltd. re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued (Jed McCaleb) (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bitstamp Ltd. re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued (Jacob Stephenson) (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bitstamp Ltd. re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued (Nancy Harris) (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bitstamp Ltd. (Case Management Conference Order and Judge Orrick's Standing Order for Civil Cases) (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION; AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY - Bitstamp is TEMPORARILY ENJOINED from transferring the $1,038,172 in disputed funds to Stellar, Stephenson, McCaleb, Ripple Labs, or any other person or entity. Response in opposition to #23 Ex Parte Application due by 5/27/2015. Reply due by 6/4/2015. Oral argument set for 6/10/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Assuming proper service, Ripple Labs may immediately notice and take the depositions of Jed McCaleb and Jacob Stephenson. These depositions shall take place during the week of May 25 - 29, 2015. Assuming proper service, McCaleb and Stephenson shall provide discovery, as detailed in the attached order, to Ripple Labs within 10 days. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/15/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 23 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and an Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue; Motion for Expedited Discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grant P. Fondo in Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and an Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, #2 Declaration of Rebecca Schwartz in Support of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and an Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue; Motion for Expedited Discovery, #3 Copy of Complaint filed by Bitstamp Ltd. pursuant to Local Rule 65-1(a)(1), #4 Proposed Order)(Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ripple Labs Inc. re #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 13, 2015 Filing 21 Declaration of George Frost in Support of #20 MOTION For an Order of Discharge or, In the Alternative, for Voluntary Dismissal filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 13, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION For an Order of Discharge or, In the Alternative, for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Bitstamp Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/27/2015. Replies due by 6/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 13, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Wheeler, Esq (Wheeler, Christopher) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 13, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Koren Nall Notice of Association of Counsel From Farella Braun + Martel LLP for Plaintiff Bitstamp, Ltd. (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/12/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/7/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ripple Labs Inc... (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Richard M. Strassberg. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
May 4, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9493373.) filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Strassberg, Richard) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/7/2015. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 10 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ripple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grant P. Fondo in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Redacted Version of Answer and Cross-Complaint, #3 Unredacted Version of Answer and Cross-Complaint, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Proposed Order)(Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 29, 2015 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Jed McCaleb, Jacob Stephenson byRipple Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 29, 2015 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ripple Labs Inc. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 29, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Lynn Chessari (Chessari, Nicole) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 29, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant P. Fondo (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy Harris, Jed McCaleb, Ripple Labs Inc., Jacob Stephenson. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 3 Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Bitstamp Ltd. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2015 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
April 1, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9409396.). Filed byBitstamp Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frost, George) (Filed on 4/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bitstamp, Ltd v. Ripple Labs Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Harris
Represented By: Paul Francis Rugani
Represented By: Mark Steven Parris
Represented By: Gabriel M. Ramsey
Represented By: Andrew Robert Ardinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ripple Labs Inc.
Represented By: Richard M Strassberg
Represented By: Grant P. Fondo
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Chessari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Jed McCaleb
Represented By: Paul Francis Rugani
Represented By: Mark Steven Parris
Represented By: Terry Gross
Represented By: Gabriel M. Ramsey
Represented By: Andrew Robert Ardinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellar Development Foundation
Represented By: Terry Gross
Represented By: Mark Steven Parris
Represented By: Adam C. Belsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Stephenson
Represented By: Paul Francis Rugani
Represented By: Mark Steven Parris
Represented By: Gabriel M. Ramsey
Represented By: Andrew Robert Ardinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bitstamp Ltd.
Represented By: Jessica Koren Nall
Represented By: Christopher C. Wheeler, Esq.
Represented By: George Frost
Represented By: Kelly Ann Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: George Frost
Represented By: Anthony Kenhong Lee
Represented By: Diane Sue Rice
Represented By: Darrell Rae Atkinson
Represented By: Spencer Hosie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?