Taylor v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Scott A Taylor
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2015cv01535
Filed: April 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 26 AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Alsup on 10/11/2016. Response due by 10/13/2016 at NOON. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carolyn W. Colvin, 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Scott A Taylor]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/25/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 19 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE HER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 17 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE RE PLAINTIFF'S FILING ERROR. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/15/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A Taylor
Represented By: Anne Michelle LaPorte
Represented By: Terry LaPorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?