Heldt v. Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd

Plaintiff: Steven Heldt
Defendant: Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd
Case Number: 3:2015cv01696
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE TCS's RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' COST OBJECTIONS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting 704 Administrative Motion to Strike Response to Plaintiff's Cost Objections . Accordingly the Court Grants Plaintiffs' motion and hereby STRIKES TCS's filing at Dkt. no. 703. The Court STRIKES portion of plaintiffs' objection as filed in violation of FRCP 54(d)(1) and Local Rule 54-2. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 695 PRETRIAL ORDER [Brian Buchanan v Tata Consultancy Services Ltd] Jury Selection set for 4/29/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. One week Jury Trial set for 4/29/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtro om 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 4/5/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2019. Compliance hearing re pretrial preparation is set for Friday, 3/8/2019 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/9/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 622 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 8 RE: OCTOBER 26, 2018 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/29/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 610 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7 RE: FAILURE TO FILE A JOINT STATEMENT re 608 and 609 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/25/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 605 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6 RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 7 & 8 by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting 525 Motion in Limine; granting 527 Motion in Limine. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 597 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5: Plaintiffs' Motion to Permit Contemporaneous Testimony from a Remote Location Under Rule 43(A); Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE plaintiffs' motion to permit remote contemporaneous testimony 497 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/17/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1,3,11, and 12 re 535 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1, 3, 11, AND 12 filed by Tat a Consultancy Services, Ltd, and 536 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1, 3, 11, AND 12 filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/16/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 592 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4 RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/15/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 496 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER RE: PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS re 508 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Clarification or Leave to Move for Reconsideration re 498 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Nobel Mandili, Seyed Amir Masoudi, Christopher Slai ght, 507 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Requesting Telephonic Hearing Regarding Update to Corrective Notice re 469 Order filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd, 506 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Requesting Telephonic Hearing Regarding Depositions of Recently-Identified Witnesses filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd.The Court DENIES plaintiffs' request for leave to file a motion for reconsideration of the Court's 9/10/18 order. Currently set 10/1/18 at 11:00am telephone conference date is maintained. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/27/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 371 Motion to Invalidate Release Agreements. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 495 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/30/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 478 Administrative Motion Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum and directing additional submission regarding 371 Motion to Invalidate Release Agreements. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 398 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 436 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The Court VACATES the hearing scheduled for August 14, 2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting 434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 431 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 [This Order relates to the class action trial in this matter and not to the individual action of Brian Buchanan which has been bifurcated. Caption for this Jury Trial case is: Christopher Slaight, et al vs. Tata Consultancy Services Ltd.]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/1/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER RE: CORRECTIVE NOTICE. Plaintiffs' request to file a response is GRANTED re 426 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Response to Supplemental Sharma Declaration re 424 Declaration in Support, filed by Nobel Mandili, Seyed Am ir Masoudi, Christopher Slaight, Brian Buchanan. Motion 425 is GRANTED. The form of corrective notice shall be submitted to the Court no later than 12 noon on Monday 8/6/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/31/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BIFURCATE; GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL; DENYING MOTION TO DECERTIFY CLASS AND MODIFYING CLASS DEFINITION; GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLASS NOTICE FORM AND PLAN; TERMINATING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT O N THE PLEADINGS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting 330 Motion to Bifurcate; granting 331 Motion to Compel; denying 335 Motion to Decertify Class and Modifying Class Definition; granting in part 368 Motion for Approval of Plaintiffs' Class Notice Form and Plan; terminating 369 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 349 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 331 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Certain Class Members' Claims. Responses due by 6/19/2018. Replies due by 7/3/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/1/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION; DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 104 Motion for Leave to File; denying 106 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 115 Motion to Certify Class; denying 125 Motion to Exclude; overruling 194 Motion to Strike. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 80 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 47 Motion to Strike ; denying 50 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint filed by 9/28/2015. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 50 MOTION to Dismiss , 47 MOTION to Strike 39 Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2015 is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 9/1 5/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2015 is CONTINUED to Tuesday 9/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/2/2015. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 22 Motion to Transfer Venue to Central District of California. The hearing scheduled for August 11, 2015 is hereby VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 21 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 26 Motion to Strike. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] re 11 Stipulation of All Parties Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint filed by Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/26/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/15/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heldt v. Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tata Consultancy Services, Ltd
Represented By: Patrick Norton Downes
Represented By: Michelle M. LaMar
Represented By: Erin Michelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Heldt
Represented By: Daniel Lee Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?