Keen et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Keen, Tamra E. Keen, Curt Conyers and Kelly E. Conyers
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01806
Filed: April 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 45 Motion for Reconsideration. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/16/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER adopting 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/22/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keen et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Keen
Represented By: William McGrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamra E. Keen
Represented By: William McGrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curt Conyers
Represented By: William McGrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly E. Conyers
Represented By: William McGrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Pamela T Johann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?