Morton & Bassett, LLC-V-Organic Spices Inc
Plaintiff: Morton & Bassett, LLC
Defendant: Organic Spices, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01849
Filed: April 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/19/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DEFERRING IN PART THE (Docket Nos. 97100, 102106, 109-5) MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER REGARDING PRIORITY ISSUES DISCUSSED AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/25/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER REGARDING BIFURCATION OF TRIAL AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A STIPULATION; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/17/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 101 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A DAUBERT MOTION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 93 Motion to Appear by Telephone at May 23, 2017 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DENYING 66 Defendant's motion for summary judgment. (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2017 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 6/12/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/14/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART THE PARTIES ( 65 , 69 ) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 74 Stipulation To Modify The Hearing Date for the Pending Motion for Summary Judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. STRIKING DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANTS 52 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 10/6/2016; Motions due by 10/28/2016; Responses due by 11/18/2016; Replies due by 11/28/2016; Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Confere nce set for 3/14/2017 03:00 PM; Jury Selection set /Jury Trial set for 3/27/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (DENYING 59 PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING A REVISED CASE SCHEDULE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER). Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/27/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S 40 MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE; SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Stipulation Parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend by Two Weeks: (1) The Deadline for Completion of Fact Discovery, and (2) Deadlines Related to Expert Witness Reports. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 44 Stipulation re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunction Relief or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike, 43 Opposition/Response to Motion.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Stipulation Re Filing Amended Complaint (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER. Fact Discovery cutoff is 4/18/2016; Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2016 03:00 PM; Jury Selection /Jury Trial set for 11/7/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/17/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morton & Bassett, LLC-V-Organic Spices Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morton & Bassett, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Meylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic Spices, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?