Trejo -v- Simmons Manufacturing Co
Plaintiff: Joseph Trejo
Defendant: Simmons Bedding Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02058
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 57 Stipulation Re: Remand to State Court. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 52 Stipulation RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE STIPULATION TO REMAND. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 50 Stipulation Re EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE STIPULATION TO REMAND. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation RE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 36 Stipulation RE: SCHEDULE FOR FILING PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL PAPERS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING S 31 TIPULATION TO WITHDRAW CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL Re 29 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/15/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation To Suspend Scheduling Order Pending Confirmed Mediation and Set Post-Mediation Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trejo -v- Simmons Manufacturing Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons Bedding Company, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Lansing Briggs
Represented By: Kymberleigh A Damron-Hsiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Trejo
Represented By: Tuvia Korobkin
Represented By: Neil Michael Larsen
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?