Barragan et al v. City of Eureka et al
Plaintiff: Jeanne Barragan and Lance McClain
Defendant: City of Eureka and Stephen Linfoot
Case Number: 3:2015cv02070
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 50 , 56 Motions in Limine. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 31 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 28 Notice (Other) filed by Jeanne Barragan, Lance McClain. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/29/2016. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Status Conference reset for 4/5/2016 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/25/2016. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Rescheduling Status Conference. Status Conference reset for 3/29/2016 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/17/2016. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/18/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/15/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barragan et al v. City of Eureka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Eureka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Linfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Barragan
Represented By: Dale Kristopher Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance McClain
Represented By: Dale Kristopher Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?