Raul R. Haro v. Therm-X of California, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raul R Haro
Defendant: Therm-X of California, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02123
Filed: May 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING re: 40 Stipulation to Dismiss filed by Therm-X of California, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/29/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raul R. Haro v. Therm-X of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul R Haro
Represented By: Richard M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Therm-X of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?