Anderson et al v. SeaWorld Parks and Entertainment
Plaintiff: Marc Anderson and Ellexa Conway
Defendant: SeaWorld Parks and Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02172
Filed: May 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW Following Bench Trial on Standing (Terminating 547 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 13, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER GRANTING 509 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice on Conditions. Deadline to accept conditions 4:00 p.m. on 3/5/2020. Deadline to joint updated witness list 12:00 p.m. on 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 4, 2020. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DOCUMENTS IDENTIFIED AS CONFIDENTIAL REMOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DUFFUS TESTIMONY SHOULD BE MAINTAINED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/13/19. Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2019.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER TO DEFENDANT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DOCUMENTS SHOULD NOT BE FILED IN THE PUBLIC RECORD. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/4/19. Show Cause Response due by 6/7/2019. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER unsealing 295 May 16, 2019 Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 28, 2019. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 247 , 248 , 250 , 268 , 273 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero resolving 249 Discovery Letter Brief regarding public relations documents. SeaWorld shall produce documents consistent with this order no later than January 22, 2019. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER requiring in camera review and further briefing to resolve 249 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 19, 2018. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER DENYING 238 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 27, 2018. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING 137 Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion for Summary Judgment and Rescheduling Hearing on 136 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 18, 2017. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER DENYING 99 Motion to Dismiss Portions of Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 30, 2017. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016) Modified on 8/1/2016 (jswlc3, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/23/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Requiring Redline Version of Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 6, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING as to 43 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART, 55 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 12, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE as to 55 MOTION for Reconsideration. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 15 Motion to Remand. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER IN RE: SEAWORLD MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION (NO. II) MDL No. 2640. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on 08/05/15. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/11/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. SeaWorld Parks and Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Anderson
Represented By: Christine Saunders Haskett
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Whittaker
Represented By: Tracy Olivia Zinsou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellexa Conway
Represented By: Christine Saunders Haskett
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Whittaker
Represented By: Tracy Olivia Zinsou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SeaWorld Parks and Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Steven Gabriel
Represented By: Lawrence Yale Iser
Represented By: Michelle C. Pardo
Represented By: John Morgan Simpson
Represented By: Kristen Louise Spanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?