Fematt v. Monterey Mechanical Co. et al

Plaintiff: Ruth Fematt
Defendant: Monterey Mechanical Co., Jim Troup and Tod Mundy
Case Number: 3:2015cv02264
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS CIVIL ACTION IN ITS ENTIRETY WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 29, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
March 14, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/11/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
January 22, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MONTEREY AND TROUP'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING THIRTEENTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF; DENYING DEFENDANT MUNDY'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 20, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing scheduled for January 22, 2016, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 20, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
October 21, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Second, Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, Twelfth and Thirteenth Claims for Relief are dismissed, the Sixth and Seventh Cla ims for Relief are dismissed to the extent they are alleged against Troop and Mundy, and the Eleventh and Twentieth Claims for Relief are dismissed to the extent they are alleged against Troop. Plaintiff is afforded leave to file, no later than Nove mber 6, 2015, a Second Amended Complaint. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 13, 2015, to December 11, 2015, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than December 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 13, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 13, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 1, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
July 24, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MONTEREY MECHANICAL CO. AND JIM TROUP'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing on the motion to dismiss filed by defendants Monterey Mechanical Co. and Jim Troup is continued to August 28, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 24, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 22, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 22, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fematt v. Monterey Mechanical Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Fematt
Represented By: Sarwinder Singh Dhanjan
Represented By: Howard Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Mechanical Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Troup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tod Mundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?