Hardy et al v. Lincoln General Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Edwin A. Hardy and Claudia Kruse
Defendant: Lincoln General Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv02265
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/28/17. Show Cause Response due by 3/17/2017.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
January 4, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation for Sixty-Day Stay of Litigation. Discovery due by 10/28/2016. Expert Witness List due by 12/2/2016. Jury Selection set for 3/22/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. J ury Trial set for 3/27/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
August 25, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/25/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
July 30, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/30/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
June 4, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/4/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy et al v. Lincoln General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln General Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Allen Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin A. Hardy
Represented By: Clay Anthony Coelho
Represented By: Randy M. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Kruse
Represented By: Clay Anthony Coelho
Represented By: Randy M. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?