Chassin Holdings Corporation v. Formula VC Ltd., et al

Plaintiff: Chassin Holdings Corporation
Defendant: Formula VC Ltd., Formula VC Fund I, L.P., Formula VC Fund I GP, L.P. and Renata Akhunova
Case Number: 3:2015cv02294
Filed: May 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Andrey Kessel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
September 21, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Adopting 80 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations; and Granting 71 Joint Motion for Settlement and Good Faith Determination. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
May 17, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney on the condition that all papers from the Court and from other parties shall continue to be served on counsel for forwarding purposes until a substitution of counsel is filed as provided by Civil Local Rule 11-5(b). (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 13, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/13/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
April 26, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/26/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 19, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 39 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
December 8, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER APPROVING MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/8/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
October 29, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request to excuse plaintiff Chassin Holdings Corporation from appearing in person at the November 5, 2015, mediation before J. Daniel Sharp is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/29/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
September 21, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 25 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF DEADLINES: Deadline to Seek Leave to Amend Pleadings: 12/2/2015Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery: 10/12/2015Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/21/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
July 21, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation to withdraw: 15 MOTION For An Order Allowing Defendant Renata Akhunova To Be Served (1) By Email, Or (2) By Email And Publication, 13 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendants Formula VC Fund I GP, L.P. and Formula VC Ltd. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/21/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chassin Holdings Corporation v. Formula VC Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chassin Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Roberto J. Kampfner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formula VC Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formula VC Fund I, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formula VC Fund I GP, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renata Akhunova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?