Ward v. United Airlines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Charles E. Ward
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02309
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ***CORRECTED*** JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 19, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 1, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
April 13, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED PLAN FOR DISSEMINATING CLASS NOTICE SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS re 48 Proposed Order filed by Charles E. Ward. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/13/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 12, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND THE CLASS DEFINITION by Hon. William Alsup denying 45 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 23, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS by Hon. William Alsup granting 30 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 1, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 12, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING granting 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 30 Responses due by 2/25/2016. Replies due by 3/3/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/12/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
June 9, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on June 9, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Ward
Represented By: Kirk David Hanson
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Susannah Kelly Howard
Represented By: Adam P. KohSweeney
Represented By: Robert Alan Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?