Wadsworth v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR) et al

Plaintiff: Christopher S. Wadsworth
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard, Timothy Belavich, Rachel Chen, Eric Monthei, Chera Van Burg, Laura Whyte, J. Clark Kelso, Eureka Daye, Andew Deems and Courtney Corrado
Case Number: 3:2015cv02322
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 73 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING RE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Motion Hearing re: settlement set for 12/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/8/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
May 11, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Christopher S. Wadsworth. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/11/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
March 11, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting CMC from 3/17/16 to 12/15/16. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
December 23, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Outcome of Related State Personnel Board Proceedings filed by Christopher S. Wadsworth. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 3, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Extending Time for Case Management Conference filed by Christopher S. Wadsworth Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2016. Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 10, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 30 Stipulation filed by Christopher S. Wadsworth. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wadsworth v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation (CDCR) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher S. Wadsworth
Represented By: Edward Joseph Caden
Represented By: Marvin Firestone
Represented By: Michael Avrim Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Belavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Monthei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chera Van Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clark Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eureka Daye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andew Deems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Corrado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?