Best-Santos v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Best-Santos
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and NBS Default Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02323
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING 123 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing previously set for 3/15/2018 continued to 4/12/2018 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/7/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Standby Order of Dismissal. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/15/2018 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/8/2018. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/29/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 79 Stipulation to Change Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/17/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 Changes to Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND VACATING EXISTING CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection/Trial set for 1/22/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor , San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/28/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER 48 re: Changes to Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/12/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING AND CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/29/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/25/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference previously set for 11/12/2015 Continued to 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/22/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION STAYING BRIEFING ON WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOITON TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNTIL COMPLETION OF LOAN MODIFICATION REVIEW AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/22/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/26/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best-Santos v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Best-Santos
Represented By: Nelson W. Goodell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBS Default Services, LLC
Represented By: Stephen T. Hicklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?