SPRAWLDEF et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al

Plaintiff: SPRAWLDEF and Sierra Club
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency and Karen Armes
Case Number: 3:2015cv02331
Filed: May 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 96 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 97 Motion to Dismiss and/or Intervene.The court grants the defendants' motion to dismiss and dismisses the plaintiffs' complaint with prejudice. Becaus e the court dismisses the allegations against FEMA, the court also dismisses the claims asserted against the Park District, Oakland, and the University. The court denies the University's motion to intervene as moot. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 19, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE: Re 53 Stipulation filed by SPRAWLDEF, Sierra Club. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/19/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
September 4, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiffs' deadline to file motion for summary judgment: 10/20/2015. Federal Defendants' deadline to file (1) opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and (2) cross-motion for summary judgment: 12/8/2 015. Plaintiffs' deadline to file (1) reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and (2) opposition to Federal Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment: 1/29/2015. Federal Defendants' deadline to file reply in support o f their cross-motion for summary judgment: 3/25/2016. Hearing date for Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and Federal Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment: 5/5/2016. The court also adopts the procedure for lodging a joint appendix that the parties proposed in ECF No. 55 in Case No. 3:15-cv-01057 LB. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/4/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
August 11, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FEDERAL DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/11/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPRAWLDEF et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPRAWLDEF
Represented By: Kelly Theodore Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Kelly Theodore Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Represented By: David Bernard Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Armes
Represented By: David Bernard Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?