Jensen v. Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Michael Jensen
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc, Johnson & Johnson Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. and Codman & Shurtleff, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02340
Filed: May 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and any hearings scheduled in this matter are VACATED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/14/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 12, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO WARN CLAIMS - Defendant withdraws 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment as moot. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/12/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
May 9, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/09/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
March 28, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference continued to 5/3/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/28/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
January 21, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE granting 32 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/21/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
August 21, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Michael Jensen Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/21/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 11, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Michael Jensen filed by Codman & Shurtleff, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc, Michael Jensen, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/11/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jensen
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Codman & Shurtleff, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?