McKay v. Knoerzer et al

Plaintiff: John Douglas McKay
Defendant: Michael Anthony Knoerzer and Clyde & Co LLP
Case Number: 3:2015cv02347
Filed: May 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER THEREON by Hon. William Alsup granting 45 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
July 29, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 21, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 20, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CORRECT RECORD by Hon. William Alsup denying 24 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 9, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 18 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Clyde & Co LLP, Michael Anthony Knoerzer. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/9/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 7, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 13 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKay v. Knoerzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Douglas McKay
Represented By: John Douglas McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anthony Knoerzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde & Co LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?