United Energy Trading, LLC v. Pacific Gas & Electric Co. et al

Plaintiff: United Energy Trading, LLC
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Co., Albert Torres, Bill Chen and Tanisha Robinson
Case Number: 3:2015cv02383
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2017 203 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 201 request to extend deadline to file reply briefs in support of motions for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/17/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
August 24, 2017 172 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 170 REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
June 26, 2017 161 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 160 TO EXTEND REBUTTAL EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/26/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
April 11, 2017 155 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 4/20/2017 Continued to 5/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
December 21, 2016 135 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO PRODUCE EXPERT AND EXPERT REBUTTAL DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
May 24, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 90 to Extend Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint and for an Enlargement of Time to File Opposition and Reply Briefs if a Motion to Dismiss is Filed. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/24/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
April 13, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
February 11, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE [#81] FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 4, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant Albert Torres' Request to be Excused from Personal Attendance at the Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
December 11, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 2/11/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
November 20, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Dismiss; denying 55 Motion for Sanctions. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 12, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
July 2, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/2/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 25, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/25/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Energy Trading, LLC v. Pacific Gas & Electric Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Energy Trading, LLC
Represented By: Leah E Capritta
Represented By: Charles Lagrange Coleman, III
Represented By: Tara Kaushik
Represented By: Thomas Drew Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Co.
Represented By: Nicholas James Begakis
Represented By: Dennis S. Ellis
Represented By: Adam Michael Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Torres
Represented By: Nicholas James Begakis
Represented By: Dennis S. Ellis
Represented By: Adam Michael Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Chen
Represented By: Nicholas James Begakis
Represented By: Dennis S. Ellis
Represented By: Adam Michael Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanisha Robinson
Represented By: Nicholas James Begakis
Represented By: Dennis S. Ellis
Represented By: Adam Michael Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?