Board of Trustees of the Northern California Plasterers Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Davidson Plastering, Inc.

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Northern California Plasterers Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Northern California Plastering Industry Pension Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Plasterers Local Union No. 66 Supplemental Retirement Benefit Fund, Board Of Trustees Of The Northern California Plasterers Joint Apprenticeship And Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Plastering Industry Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust Fund and Chester Murphy
Defendant: Davidson Plastering, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02386
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1131
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/19/2016. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
December 29, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Second Order to Submit Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/29/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
October 8, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/8/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Northern California Plasterers Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Davidson Plastering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Northern California Plasterers Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Northern California Plastering Industry Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Plasterers Local Union No. 66 Supplemental Retirement Benefit Fund
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board Of Trustees Of The Northern California Plasterers Joint Apprenticeship And Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Plastering Industry Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust Fund
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Murphy
Represented By: Wan Yan Ling
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson Plastering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?