Shiner v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Plaintiff: Carla Shiner
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv02391
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Carla Shiner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/20/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
March 10, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Request for Telephonic Appearance filed by Carla Shiner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/10/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
September 3, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/3/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 21, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Request to Appear Telephonically at Initial Case Management Hearing filed by Carla Shiner. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/21/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shiner v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Shiner
Represented By: Stewart Charles Altemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Mariel Covarrubias
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?