Les Fields/C.C.H.I. Insurance Services v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Les Fields/C.C.H.I. Insurance Services
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv02411
Filed: May 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/2/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
March 8, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY Further Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/8/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
January 11, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STATUS REPORT AND ORDER MAINTAINING STAY UNTIL MARCH 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/11/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
November 8, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/8/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
August 3, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/3/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 29, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/29/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
May 9, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY re 41 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/9/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 29, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR STATUS REPORT Status Report due by 5/6/2016 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/29/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
January 25, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE Status Report due by 4/25/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/25/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 7, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JOINDER, LEAVE TO AMEND, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, Motions terminated: 27 MOTION for Joinder filed by Les Fields/C.C.H.I. Insurance Services. Show Cause Response due by 1/18/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
December 29, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/29/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
July 7, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
July 6, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 16 Stipulation. Answer due 9/2/15.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Les Fields/C.C.H.I. Insurance Services v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Fields/C.C.H.I. Insurance Services
Represented By: Bernard Paul Kenneally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?