Troy Walker v. ConAgra Foods, Inc.

Plaintiff: Troy Walker
Defendant: ConAgra Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02424
Filed: June 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE OVERLENGTH MOTION TO DISMISS. Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 2, 2016. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
September 3, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/3/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 11, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE Scheduling Order for Motion to Dismiss and Initial Case Management Conference. Replies due by 8/20/2015. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffr ey S. White. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/11/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
June 4, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/4/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troy Walker v. ConAgra Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConAgra Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Laura E Coombe
Represented By: Allen Brooks Gresham, II
Represented By: Angela M Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Walker
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?