Sprint Solutions, Inc. et al v. Snyder et al

Plaintiff: Sprint Solutions, Inc. and Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Defendant: John Russell Snyder and Thirty-One Echo, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02439
Filed: June 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 26 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Joint Case Management Statement due 11/2/2017. Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/27/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017) Modified text on 9/27/2017 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS. On or before 6/15/2016, each party shall file a brief written response, not exceeding three pages in length, which addresses the court's proposal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2016. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
April 14, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE. In light of the pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 26 ), the Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 4/28/2016, is VACATED and will be reset upon resolution of the motion. Signed by Judge Edward J.Davila on 4/14/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Solutions, Inc. et al v. Snyder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Valerie Diana Escalante
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: Valerie Diana Escalante
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Russell Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thirty-One Echo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?