Haynes 3rd v. Cobb et al

Plaintiff: Lewis Haynes, 3rd
Defendant: Diane E. Cobb, D.M. Financial, Paul Sloane Davis and Vandyk Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv02455
Filed: June 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/16/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
November 2, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/3/2015 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/12/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/2/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
August 25, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Order Setting Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 10/26/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/25/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 17, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER:Case referred to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for SettlementDeadline to Seek Leave to Amend Pleadings: 11/6/2015Discovery due by 2/2/2016Motions due by 3/3/2016Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2016 Jury Trial set for 8/29/2016 Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/17/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
June 24, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/24/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes 3rd v. Cobb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Haynes, 3rd
Represented By: Stephen A. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane E. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.M. Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sloane Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vandyk Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?