Barraza v. Cricket Wireless, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Flor Barraza
Defendant: Cricket Wireless, LLC, AT&T Inc., and Leap Wireless International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02471
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 104 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 17, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS Motions due by 1/5/2016. Responses due by 1/19/2016. Notice of Rule 68 acceptance due by 12/18/2015 at NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/17/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 8, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MOVING HEARING Further Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/8/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 4, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SUMMARY JURY TRIAL re 93 Further Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 1/11/2016 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/4/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 3, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR INFORMATION Responses due by 12/4/2015 at Noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/3/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 20, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 87 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 18, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE SUMMARY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/18/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 3, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR SUMMARY TRIAL ***moving trial to 12/15 Jury Selection set for 12/15/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/3/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 16, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/16/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 6, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION TO FILE CORRECTED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting 52 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
September 11, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY DISPUTE, ***ADJUSTING TIME*** Set/Reset Deadlines as to 46 Discovery Letter Brief. Responses due by 9/15/2015. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2015 12:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Two-hour meet-and-confer in jury room at 10:00 A.M.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/11/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 31, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONTO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Hon. William Alsup denying 40 Motion to Stay.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 28, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART THE PARTIES STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION re 43 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Nikole Henson, Flor Barraza, 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 40 MOTION to Stay Obligations Under the Co urt's Scheduling Orders Pending Resolution of Defendants' Pending Motion to Compel Arbitration, 34 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to filed by Flor Barraza Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2015. Replies due by 10/16/2015. Responses due by 10/5/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/28/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 27, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Hon. William Alsup denying 41 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
July 7, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 30 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
June 29, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE of Scott Schacthman by Hon. William Alsup granting 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 19, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE OF ARCHIS A. PARASHARAMI by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 18, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE OF A. SCOTT WADDELL by Hon. William Alsup granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 17, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY BRYCE B. BELL by Hon. William Alsup denying 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 10, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 10, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barraza v. Cricket Wireless, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor Barraza
Represented By: Bryce B Bell
Represented By: Barbara Frankland
Represented By: Keith Allyn Robinson
Represented By: Scott A Shachtman
Represented By: Rex Sharp
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cricket Wireless, LLC
Represented By: Raymond Paul Bolanos
Represented By: Catherine Chung Lan Hwang
Represented By: Archis Ashok Parasharami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.,
Represented By: Raymond Paul Bolanos
Represented By: Catherine Chung Lan Hwang
Represented By: Archis Ashok Parasharami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leap Wireless International, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Paul Bolanos
Represented By: Catherine Chung Lan Hwang
Represented By: Archis Ashok Parasharami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?