Moralez v. Rowen et al

Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Defendant: Robert Rowen, Teresa Su and Calhoun Family Trust
Case Number: 3:2015cv02472
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Re 13 Case Management Statement filed by Francisca Moralez. A Joint Updated Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2016. Case Management Conference reset to 3/10/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/8/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 17, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This is an ADA case that is subject to the case-management deadlines set forth in this districts General Order 56. The plaintiff filed a complaint on June 3, 2015. (ECF No. 1.)No defendant has appeared; the plaintiff did dismi ss the Calhoun Family Trust. (ECF No. 8.) Nothing on the docket suggests any activity that is required by General Order 56 (such as a joint site inspection or a Notice of Need for Mediation). (See General Order 56 3, 6.) Under the circumstances, the court orders the plaintiff to show cause in writing by November 23, 2015 why this action should not dismissed without prejudice for her failure to prosecute it. The response must include any request for a change in the scheduling order at ECF No. 3 and include the plaintiffs plan for proceeding in the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/17/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
July 31, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT, CALHOUN FAMILY TRUST ONLY, WITH PREJUDICE: Re 8 Notice (Other) filed by Francisca Moralez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/31/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moralez v. Rowen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisca Moralez
Represented By: Russell Scott Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calhoun Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?