Aston et al v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Plaintiff: Justin Aston and Steven De Borba
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02497
Filed: June 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 48 STIPULATION to Continue: Deadline re Class Certification Discovery, Further Case Management Conference, and Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2016 . Further Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/20/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016) Modified on 7/20/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 37 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing and Related Deadlines for Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/28/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
September 15, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/15/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
June 15, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/15/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aston et al v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Alexandra Brown
Represented By: E. Jeffrey Grube, Esq.
Represented By: Katherine C Huibonhoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Aston
Represented By: Walter Lewis Haines
Represented By: Graham Stephen Paul Hollis
Represented By: Joseph E. Jaramillo
Represented By: Marta Manus
Represented By: David Roger Markham
Represented By: Janine Renee Menhennet
Represented By: Peggy J. Reali
Represented By: Maggie K. Realin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven De Borba
Represented By: Walter Lewis Haines
Represented By: Graham Stephen Paul Hollis
Represented By: Joseph E. Jaramillo
Represented By: Marta Manus
Represented By: David Roger Markham
Represented By: Janine Renee Menhennet
Represented By: Peggy J. Reali
Represented By: Maggie K. Realin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?