Harris v. Thomas et al

Plaintiff: Tonie L. Harris
Defendant: Rossi Thomas and United Airlines
Case Number: 3:2015cv02510
Filed: June 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 STIPULATION TO FURTHER CONTINUE ALL DATES - Close of Fact Discovery: 11/1/2017. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 1/17/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2018 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 4/23/2018 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/12/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
February 10, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE ALL DATES AND STAY MATTER. Matter is stayed for 90 days. Close of Fact Discovery: 7/17/2017. Dispositive motions to be heard by 10/18/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 2/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
July 18, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
May 20, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
February 26, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/26/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
November 12, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding sufficiency of Amended Complaint 11 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. If Plaintiff wishes to file a second amended complaint to pursue FEHA claims, she may do so no later than December 14, 2015. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 12, 2015. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonie L. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossi Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?