City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System v. Revance Therapeutics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System
Defendant: Revance Therapeutics, Inc., L. Daniel Browne, Lauren P. Silvernail, Jacob Waugh, Robert Byrnes, Ronald W. Eastman, Phyllis Gardner, James Glasheen, Jonathan Tunnicliffe, Ronald Wooten, Cowen and Company, LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., BMO Capital Markets Corp. and William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02512
Filed: June 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 8 MOTION TO REMAND. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
July 15, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 2, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 19, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 17, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 11 Stipulation re 8 MOTION to Remand Extending Time to Oppose Motion to Remand. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System v. Revance Therapeutics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revance Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Daniel Browne
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren P. Silvernail
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Waugh
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Byrnes
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald W. Eastman
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Gardner
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Glasheen
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Tunnicliffe
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Wooten
Represented By: Shannon Marie Eagan, Esq.
Represented By: Adam Christopher Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company, LLC
Represented By: Joshua David Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Represented By: Joshua David Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Joshua David Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Joshua David Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System
Represented By: James Ian Jaconette
Represented By: Thomas C Michaud
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?