Eisenhart v. Wells Fargo & Company et al

Plaintiff: Sharon Eisenhart
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Wachovia Corporation Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2015cv02522
Filed: June 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 33 Order,, Set Hearings, filed by Sharon Eisenhart, ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. The Compliance hearing set for 9:01 AM on Friday, December 11, 2015 is taken off calendar. The parties need not appear. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/7/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 9, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. The 11/13/2015 Order to Show Cause hearing is VACATED. A Compliance Hearing re finalization of settlement documents is set for Friday, 12/11/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/9/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
October 28, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS; VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/13/2015 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2015. The Compliance hearing set 10/30/15 and the case management conference set for 11/2/15 are hereby VACATED.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/28/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 2, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 10/30/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/2/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
September 1, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING ALL ADR DATES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Wachovia Corporation Long Term Disability Plan, Wells Fargo & Company, Sharon Eisenhart Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2015. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/22/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/1/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eisenhart v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Eisenhart
Represented By: Brent Dorian Brehm
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Corporation Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?