Wilkerson et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (FKA Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.)

Plaintiff: John Wilkerson and Emma Wilkerson
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (FKA Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.)
Case Number: 3:2015cv02539
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Calaveras
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/01/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
November 24, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT PROCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/24/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
September 9, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/09/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (FKA Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilkerson
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Wilkerson
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (FKA Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?