Russian Hill Capital, LP v. Energy Corporation of America

Plaintiff: Russian Hill Capital, LP
Defendant: Energy Corporation of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv02554
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 49 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Energy Corporation of America. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
July 14, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 46 Stipulated Protective Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 16, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 7/28/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/16/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
May 19, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/19/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 2, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 10/5/2016; Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2017 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 4/3/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/2/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
March 29, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Stipulation SETTING TIME FOR RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 15, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 20 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT, AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
September 24, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
August 21, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Stipulation TO POSTPONE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
July 15, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S PLANNED MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
June 18, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russian Hill Capital, LP v. Energy Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Corporation of America
Represented By: Michael L. Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russian Hill Capital, LP
Represented By: Jonathan B. Gaskin
Represented By: Steve Kaufhold
Represented By: Quynh K Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?