ADP, LLC v. YourPeople, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: ADP, LLC
Defendant: YourPeople, Inc. and Parker Conrad
Case Number: 3:2015cv02560
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/28/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
August 26, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 44 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
July 21, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 30 Stipulation to Continue September 8, 2015 Case Management Conference to September 22, 2015 and Set Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 17, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Rosenkranz.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 7, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/7/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
June 29, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/29/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADP, LLC v. YourPeople, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YourPeople, Inc.
Represented By: Annette L. Hurst
Represented By: Jeremy Peterman
Represented By: E. Joshua Rosenkranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Conrad
Represented By: Annette L. Hurst
Represented By: Jeremy Peterman
Represented By: E. Joshua Rosenkranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADP, LLC
Represented By: Zachary Hill
Represented By: Kristen A. Palumbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?