People With Disabilities Foundation v. Colvin

Plaintiff: People With Disabilities Foundation
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Case Number: 3:2015cv02570
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS 34 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/19/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
October 28, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation Continuing Hearing on Defendant's 34 Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
June 24, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Stipulation Re Responsive Pleading and Briefing Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
November 4, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO NOVEMBER 20, 2015 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPPOSITION RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S 20 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
September 22, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation for Leave to Amend Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
August 12, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Stipulation Continuing Deadline for Responsive Pleading and Initial Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
July 7, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/7/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People With Disabilities Foundation v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People With Disabilities Foundation
Represented By: Steven F. Bruce, PWDF
Represented By: Steven Frederick Egler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?