North Star Gas Company v. Pacific Gas and Electric Company et al

Plaintiff: North Star Gas Company
Defendant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Albert Torres, Bill Chen and Tanisha Robinson
Case Number: 3:2015cv02575
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS 60 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2017; Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
August 29, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE STATEMENT. Statement due by 8/31/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/29/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
January 24, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' 60 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/24/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
November 18, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 60 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/5/2016; Replies due by 12/22/2016.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 2, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 57 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 3, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 54 Stipulated REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 6-2 AND 7-12. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 26, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 22 MOTION TO STAY AND/OR DISMISS; DENYING DEFENDANTS' 32 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 24, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation Re 25 Joint Case Management Statement. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 10, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation Regarding Response to Complaint and for Order Changing Time (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Star Gas Company v. Pacific Gas and Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Star Gas Company
Represented By: Leah E Capritta
Represented By: Charles Lagrange Coleman, III
Represented By: Tara Kaushik
Represented By: Thomas Drew Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanisha Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?