Becker v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al

Plaintiff: Michelle L Becker
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union LLC and Capital One Bank (USA) National Association
Case Number: 3:2015cv02606
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 44 Stipulation filed by Michelle L Becker. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/7/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 10, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Experian Info Solutions filed by Michelle L Becker. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/9/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 2, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/2/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
September 15, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 Protective Order) filed by Michelle L Becker. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
August 20, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Michelle L Becker filed by Michelle L Becker. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/20/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
July 2, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/2/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becker v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Monica Katz-Lapides
Represented By: Justin T. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L Becker
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?