Robert O'Brien v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert O'Brien
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and Quality Loan Service Corp.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02623
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert O'Brien. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
June 27, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 42 Case Management Conference filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. First Amended Complaint due 7/8/2016. Deadline to add parties and amend pleadings 9/30/2016. Fact discovery cutoff 2/28/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motion 3/30/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 - 7/20/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 1, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL re 37 Ex Parte Application to Be Relieved as Counsel filed by Robert O'Brien Further Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 18, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2016. Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
February 8, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 30 Notice filed by Robert O'Brien Dismissal or Statement due by 3/17/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 27, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying 12 Notice of Motion to Expunge Notice of Pendency of Action or Require a Bond. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
November 23, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/23/2015. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
October 5, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 12 MOTION for Hearing filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.; 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
August 31, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 31, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert O'Brien v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert O'Brien
Represented By: Michael Patrick Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Represented By: Ofunne Nkechi Edoziem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?