Tenaza v. Allstate Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Richard Tenaza
Defendant: Allstate Life Insurance Company, Chase Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02634
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice filed by Allstate Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
October 7, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Mediation Deadline filed by Allstate Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 7, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
September 23, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties 10/2/2015. Mediation deadline 11/30/2015. Fact discovery due 4/15/2016. Dispositive motions due 4/29/2016. Expert disclosures due 6/10/2016. Expert rebuttal due 7/1/2016. Expert discovery due 7/26/2 016. Pretrial conference statement due 8/23/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Bench Trial set for 9/26/2016 - 10/20/2015 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 23, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
August 28, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Allstate Life Insurance Company filed by Allstate Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
July 14, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Chase Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 14, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenaza v. Allstate Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Represented By: Cindy Mekari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Neal Scott Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tenaza
Represented By: Dean Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?