Richard Johnson et al v. Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc et al
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson and Marcella Johnson
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc and Georgia Pacific, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02664
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Granting Parties' Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. (fka Todd Shipyards Corporation) filed by Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 for Dismissal of Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC only filed by Georgia Pacific, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/7/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ANY ASBESTOS EXPOSURE CLAIMS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 FROM DEFENDANT PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION) filed by Richard Johnson, Devin Johnson, Tiffaney Johnson, Marcella Johnson. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: EXTENSION OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION AND EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Status Report due by 12/15/2016. Status Conference set for 12/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/12/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/24/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: VACATING DEADLINES AND TRIAL DATE DUE TO PLAINTIFF RICHARD JOHNSONS DEATH, AND MAINTAINING FEBRUARY 4, 2016, FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Richard Johnson. Case Management Statement due by 2/2/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset from 2/4/2016 to 2/9/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Johnson et al v. Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Johnson
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc
Represented By: Michael C Guasco
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Represented By: Eric Dean Sentlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?