Roy v. Contra Costa County et al

Plaintiff: Chadrick Willie Roy
Defendant: Contra Costa County, David O. Livingston, Contra Costa County Sheriff's Office, City of Concord and Guy Swanger
Case Number: 3:2015cv02672
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson Granting 39 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 40 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 16, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 12/16/2015. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 3, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER To Continue Hearing Date as to 39 and 40 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset for 12/21/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/02/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
September 29, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 14 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 28, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue deadline for exchange of initial disclosures, filing of Rule 26(f) report, CMC statement and to continue CMC. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/28/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy v. Contra Costa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadrick Willie Roy
Represented By: Tiega Noel Varlack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David O. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Concord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Swanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?