Baker et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Baker and Joann Baker
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Wilmington Trust, National Association
Case Number: 3:2015cv02676
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/14/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016) Modified on 6/14/2016 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND REQUIRING FURTHER JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/13/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING 65 STIPULATION to Stay Litigation; AND CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/4/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADMONISHING COUNSEL AND DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/15/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/14/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016) Modified on 1/14/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Telephone conference set for 1/4/2016 11:00 AM. Settlement Conference set for 1/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 12/14/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/24/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REGARDING 28 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Responses due by 7/31/2015. Replies due by 8/7/2015. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/20/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Motion due by 6/18/2015. Responses due by 12:00 p.m. on 6/22/2015. Replies due by 12:00 p.m. on 6/24/2015. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/17/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 4 Ex Parte Application filed by Jeffrey Baker, Joann Baker. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 16, 2015. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Baker
Represented By: Eunji Cho
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Baker
Represented By: Eunji Cho
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Bradford Ellis Klein
Represented By: Ryan Kirk Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By: Ryan Kirk Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?