Coyle v. Geissler et al

Plaintiff: Simon G. Coyle
Defendant: Peter S. Geissler and Peter Geissler & Associates
Case Number: 3:2015cv02691
Filed: June 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION TO DISMISS; ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 22, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
January 5, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court DECLARATION OF ANDREW S. CANTOR REGARDING AGREEMENT WITH PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER BY THIRTY DAYS; ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE. The deadline for defendants to respond to the Second Amended Complaint is extended from January 5, 2016, to February 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
October 7, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. To facilitate the Court's review of the case, plaintiff is directed to submit chambers copies of the following documents: complaint, amended complaint, and Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coyle v. Geissler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon G. Coyle
Represented By: David E. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter S. Geissler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Geissler & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?