Mays v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Phillip Mays
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2015cv02731
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 29 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
March 24, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING OSC. Plaintiff's Reply brief and Statement of Facts due by 4/14/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/24/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 21, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 3/28/2016. No chambers copy is required. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/21/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
February 24, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion.(cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
December 10, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 22 STIPULATION For A First Extension For Defendant to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Cross Motion and Separate Statement of Facts due by 2/17/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/10/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
October 19, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FAILURE TO FILE STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Parties shall meet and confer by 11/2/2015. Joint or Separate Statement due 11/16/2015. Defendant's Cross-Motion due 12/14/2015. Plaintiff's Reply due 12/28/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/19/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
July 13, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/13/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Mays
Represented By: Lisa Lunsford
Represented By: Nancy E. McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Carolyn Beth Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?