Fitch v. San Francisco Unified School District

Plaintiff: Sylvia Fitch
Defendant: San Francisco Unified School District
Case Number: 3:2015cv02769
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT (90 day conditional). Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/17/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
July 29, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (corrected) Re: STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 59 Order, 67 Clerk's Notice, 65 Order, APPLICATION FOR ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF ABDUL LATIF IN OCTOBER filed by San Francisco Unified School District. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/29/16. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/29/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
June 13, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 45 Order on Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order filed by San Francisco Unified School District. Jury Selection set for 3/13/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th F loor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 9, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER HOLDING ABDUL LATIF IN CIVIL CONTEMPT AND ORDERING MR. LATIF TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION ON JUNE 29, 2016 AT 10 AM IN COURTROOM 1 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 25, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 55 Ex Parte Application re 54 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Hearings, 52 Declaration in Support, 53 Proposed Order to Continue Hearing filed by Sylvia Fitch. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/9/2016 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/25/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 23, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 51 Ex Parte Application For Order To Show Cause Re Contempt For Failure To Appear Pursuant To Subpoena (Abdul Latif) filed by Sylvia Fitch. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/2/2016 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/20/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
March 15, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
October 29, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS 20 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitch v. San Francisco Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Fitch
Represented By: Richard M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?