Patricia Moreland v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Patricia Moreland
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv02893
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL filed by Patricia Moreland. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 23, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/8/2016 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 23, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
October 7, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings 10/12/2015; Mediation deadline 12/31/2015; Fact discovery cut-off 3/1/2016; Deadline to file cross-dispositive motions 4/1/2016. Bench Trial set for 6/8/2016 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 7, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
August 5, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/5/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricia Moreland v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Moreland
Represented By: Andrew Michael Kantor
Represented By: Glenn R. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Dawn Noel Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?