CSAA Insurance Exchange v. Best Buy Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: CSAA Insurance Exchange
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv02899
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 63 Joint Motion for Settlement. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/3/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Request to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference 38 filed by CSAA Insurance Exchange. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/31/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Stipulation to Continue ADR Deadline to 7/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/2/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSAA Insurance Exchange v. Best Buy Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Represented By: Miriam Ortiz Renzi
Represented By: David Vincent Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSAA Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Alan J. Jang
Represented By: Priya Navaratnasingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?