Norfolk County Retirement System v. Solazyme, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Norfolk County Retirement System
Defendant: Solazyme, Inc., Jonathan S. Wolfson, Tyler W. Painter, David C. Cole, Jerry Fiddler, Michael V. Arbige, Ian T. Clark, Peter Kovacs, James R. Craigie, Goldman, Sachs & Co. and Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv02938
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 89 Stipulation Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule for Motion(s) to Dismiss Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2017; Motions due by 3/17/2017; Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
December 29, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( 72 , 75 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2017.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
March 22, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 77 Stipulation Regarding the Page Limitation for Lead Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
November 9, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 69 Stipulation re Scheduling (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
October 20, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 63 Motion to Relate Case to 3:15-cv-03880-RS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 8, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 29 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL( 16 , 22 , 26 , 27 , 31 Motions are terminated) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 5, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Corban Rhodes. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 1, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfolk County Retirement System v. Solazyme, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk County Retirement System
Represented By: Michael Walter Stocker
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solazyme, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan S. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler W. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Fiddler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael V. Arbige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian T. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Kovacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Craigie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?